NJ S2168 | 2024-2025 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous S532
Note: Carry Over of previous A2494
Note: Carry Over of previous A2494
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-14 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Pending: Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-14 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Pending: Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides tuition fee waiver apprenticeship courses.
Title
Provides tuition fee waiver apprenticeship courses.
Sponsors
Sen. Teresa Ruiz [D] | Sen. Nellie Pou [D] | Sen. Michael Testa [R] | Sen. Troy Singleton [D] |
Sen. Linda Greenstein [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-03-14 - Senate - Senate Labor Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-14 | Senate | Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2024-01-09 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Labor Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S532 (Carry Over) 2022-03-07 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
A2494 (Carry Over) 2022-10-17 - Reported out of Asm. Comm. with Amendments, and Referred to Assembly Higher Education Committee
A513 (Same As) 2024-02-05 - Reported out of Asm. Comm. with Amendments, and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
A2494 (Carry Over) 2022-10-17 - Reported out of Asm. Comm. with Amendments, and Referred to Assembly Higher Education Committee
A513 (Same As) 2024-02-05 - Reported out of Asm. Comm. with Amendments, and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee