NJ S2166 | 2014-2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Vetoed on May 14 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-14 - Absolute Veto, Received in the Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on May 14 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-14 - Absolute Veto, Received in the Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
"Comprehensive Regulated Grease Recycling Act."
Title
"Comprehensive Regulated Grease Recycling Act."
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-26 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute For A1586 Asa (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-26 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 42 N: 31 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-26 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 42 N: 31 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-26 - Assembly - Assembly Substitute For A1586 Asa (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-19 - Assembly - Assembly Environment and Solid Waste Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-05 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 23 N: 11 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-05 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 23 N: 11 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-12 - Senate - Senate Environment and Energy Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-26 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 42 N: 31 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-26 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 42 N: 31 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-26 - Assembly - Assembly Substitute For A1586 Asa (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-19 - Assembly - Assembly Environment and Solid Waste Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-05 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 23 N: 11 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-05 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 23 N: 11 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-12 - Senate - Senate Environment and Energy Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-14 | Senate | Absolute Veto, Received in the Senate |
2015-03-26 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (42-31-0) |
2015-03-26 | Assembly | Substituted for A1586 (AS/1R) |
2015-03-19 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2015-02-05 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Environment and Solid Waste Committee |
2015-02-05 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (23-11) |
2015-01-13 | Senate | Rescind Action of REF TO SBA on 1/13/2015 |
2015-01-13 | Senate | Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2015-01-13 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2014-06-09 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A1586 (Same As) 2015-03-26 - Substituted by S2166 (1R)