NJ S2140 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous S877
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 2 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-13 - Motion To Table (20-14) (Weinberg)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 2 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-13 - Motion To Table (20-14) (Weinberg)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Limits payment to certain public employees for accumulated sick leave upon retirement; requires fine and reprimand or termination for violation of sick leave by public employee.
Title
Limits payment to certain public employees for accumulated sick leave upon retirement; requires fine and reprimand or termination for violation of sick leave by public employee.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-13 - Senate - Senate Floor: Table Motion (Y: 21 N: 13 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-13 | Senate | Motion To Table (20-14) (Weinberg) |
2017-03-13 | Senate | Motion Relieve from Committee (Beck) |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Motion To Table (21-13) (Weinberg) |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Motion Order of the Day (Beck) |
2016-05-02 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S877 (Carry Over) 2014-01-14 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee
A4916 (Same As) 2017-06-01 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee
A4916 (Same As) 2017-06-01 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee