NJ S2116 | 2024-2025 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous S2433
Note: Carry Over of previous A3163
Note: Carry Over of previous A3163
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 9 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2025-03-17 - Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2025-03-17 - Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that organ donor designation on driver's license or identification card remains upon renewal of license or card under certain circumstances.
Title
Provides that organ donor designation on driver's license or identification card remains upon renewal of license or card under certain circumstances.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2025-03-17 - Senate - Senate Transportation Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2025-03-17 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2024-01-09 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Transportation Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S2433 (Carry Over) 2022-05-09 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Transportation Committee
A3163 (Carry Over) 2022-03-07 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee
A5602 (Same As) -
A3163 (Carry Over) 2022-03-07 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee
A5602 (Same As) -