NJ S2109 | 2014-2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on August 10 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-08-10 - Approved P.L.2015, c.90.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on August 10 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-08-10 - Approved P.L.2015, c.90.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Clarifies that county sheriff may simultaneously hold position of emergency management coordinator.
Title
Clarifies that county sheriff may simultaneously hold position of emergency management coordinator.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-25 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute For A3344 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-25 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-25 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-25 - Assembly - Assembly Substitute For A3344 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-04 - Assembly - Assembly Homeland Security and State Preparedness Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-26 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-26 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-19 - Senate - Senate Law and Public Safety Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-25 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-25 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-25 - Assembly - Assembly Substitute For A3344 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-04 - Assembly - Assembly Homeland Security and State Preparedness Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-26 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-26 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-19 - Senate - Senate Law and Public Safety Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-08-10 | Assembly | Approved P.L.2015, c.90. |
2015-06-25 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (76-0-0) |
2015-06-25 | Assembly | Substituted for A3344 |
2015-06-04 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2014-06-26 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Homeland Security and State Preparedness Committee |
2014-06-26 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (40-0) |
2014-06-19 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2014-05-19 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A3344 (Same As) 2015-06-25 - Substituted by S2109