NJ S2071 | 2010-2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on December 8 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-12-08 - Approved P.L.2010, c.100.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on December 8 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-12-08 - Approved P.L.2010, c.100.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Limits amount of time a vacant teaching position can be filled by certain teachers employed in a temporary capacity.
Title
Limits amount of time a vacant teaching position can be filled by certain teachers employed in a temporary capacity.
Sponsors
Rep. Ralph Caputo [D] | Rep. Jason O'Donnell [D] | Sen. Teresa Ruiz [D] | Rep. Cleopatra Tucker [D] |
Sen. Shirley Turner [D] |
Roll Calls
2010-10-25 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-28 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-28 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-12-08 | Approved P.L.2010, c.100. | |
2010-10-25 | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (78-0-0) | |
2010-10-25 | Substituted for A3218 | |
2010-10-14 | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading | |
2010-06-28 | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Education Committee | |
2010-06-28 | Passed by the Senate (40-0) | |
2010-06-21 | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading | |
2010-06-10 | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Education Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A3218 (Same As) 2010-10-25 - Substituted by S2071 (1R)