NJ S2055 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 25 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-01-17 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Permits incarcerated persons to receive student financial aid.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Permits incarcerated persons to receive student financial aid.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-01-17 - Assembly - Assembly Higher Education Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 27 N: 10 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-11 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 8 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-05 - Senate - Senate Higher Eduction Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-01-17AssemblyReported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
2018-06-25AssemblyReceived in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Higher Education Committee
2018-06-25SenatePassed by the Senate (27-10)
2018-06-11SenateReported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
2018-04-05SenateReferred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
2018-04-05SenateReported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2018-02-26SenateIntroduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Higher Education Committee

Same As/Similar To

A3722 (Same As) 2019-01-17 - Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback