NJ S2049 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on August 9 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-08-09 - Approved P.L.2016, c.22.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Establishes three-year nonpublic school pupil transportation pilot program in Lakewood School District to provide funding to consortium of nonpublic schools that will assume responsibility for district's mandated nonpublic school busing.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishes three-year nonpublic school pupil transportation pilot program in Lakewood School District to provide funding to consortium of nonpublic schools that will assume responsibility for district's mandated nonpublic school busing.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-06-30 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 41 N: 27 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-28 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute For A3652 Aca (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-23 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 22 N: 8 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-16 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-08-09AssemblyApproved P.L.2016, c.22.
2016-06-30AssemblyPassed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (41-27-3)
2016-06-27AssemblySubstituted for A3652 (1R)
2016-06-23AssemblyReceived in the Assembly without Reference, 2nd Reading
2016-06-23SenatePassed by the Senate (22-8)
2016-06-16SenateReported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2016-05-26SenateTransferred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
2016-04-21SenateIntroduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Education Committee

Same As/Similar To

A3652 (Same As) 2016-06-27 - Substituted by S2049 (1R)

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback