NJ S2037 | 2014-2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 30 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-10-27 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 30 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-10-27 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Removes statutory requirement that health officers and registered environmental health specialists employed by municipalities receive maximum salary within their range within five years from date of appointment.
Title
Removes statutory requirement that health officers and registered environmental health specialists employed by municipalities receive maximum salary within their range within five years from date of appointment.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-10-27 - Assembly - Assembly State and Local Government Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-30 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-30 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-26 - Senate - Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-30 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-30 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-26 - Senate - Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-10-27 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2014-07-11 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee |
2014-06-30 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (35-0) |
2014-06-26 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2014-05-05 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A2798 (Same As) 2014-10-27 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading