NJ S2030 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future S606
Note: Carry Foward to future A3080
Note: Carry Over of previous A4220
Note: Carry Foward to future A3080
Note: Carry Over of previous A4220
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 26 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-21 - Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 26 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-21 - Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes one New Jersey Suicide Prevention Advisory Council in DOH.
Title
Establishes one New Jersey Suicide Prevention Advisory Council in DOH.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-21 - Senate - Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-21 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S2030 (Carry Over) 2018-05-21 - Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
S2030 (Carry Over) 2018-05-21 - Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
A4220 (Carry Over) 2016-10-06 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee
A3645 (Same As) 2020-01-13 - Passed by the Assembly (76-0-0)
S2030 (Carry Over) 2018-05-21 - Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
A4220 (Carry Over) 2016-10-06 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee
A3645 (Same As) 2020-01-13 - Passed by the Assembly (76-0-0)