NJ S2013 | 2010-2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on June 3 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-01-10 - Substituted by A2721 (2R)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on June 3 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-01-10 - Substituted by A2721 (2R)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Changes five year chapter expiration date for rules to seven years; changes procedures for readoption of rules.
Title
Changes five year chapter expiration date for rules to seven years; changes procedures for readoption of rules.
Sponsors
Sen. Dawn Addiego [D] | Sen. Jennifer Beck [R] | Sen. Kevin O'Toole [R] | Sen. Steven Oroho [R] |
Sen. Brian Stack [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-01-10 | Substituted by A2721 (2R) | |
2010-12-20 | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading | |
2010-12-06 | Transferred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee | |
2010-06-03 | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A2721 (Same As) 2011-04-06 - Approved P.L.2011, c.45.
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2010/S2013 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2010/S2500/2013_I1.HTM |