NJ S2003 | 2014-2015 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Passed on August 10 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-08-10 - Approved P.L.2015, c.89.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Makes certain reforms to juvenile justice system.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Makes certain reforms to juvenile justice system.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-06-29 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 29 N: 10 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-29 - Senate - Senate Amend (Y: 29 N: 10 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-25 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute For A4299 Acs (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-25 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 53 N: 24 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-25 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 53 N: 24 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-25 - Assembly - Assembly Substitute For A4299 Acs (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-15 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-01 - Assembly - Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-18 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 24 N: 10 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-18 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 24 N: 10 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-12 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-12 - Senate - Senate Law and Public Safety Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-08-10SenateApproved P.L.2015, c.89.
2015-06-29SenatePassed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (29-10)
2015-06-25SenateReceived in the Senate, 2nd Reading on Concurrence
2015-06-25AssemblyPassed by the Assembly (53-24-1)
2015-06-25AssemblySubstituted for A4299 (ACS)
2015-06-15AssemblyReported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
2015-06-01AssemblyReported out of Asm. Comm. with Amendments, and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
2015-06-01AssemblyReceived in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee
2015-05-18SenatePassed by the Senate (24-10)
2015-05-14SenateReported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2015-03-12SenateReferred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
2015-03-12SenateReported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading without recommendation
2014-04-28SenateIntroduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee

Same As/Similar To

A4299 (Same As) 2015-06-25 - Substituted by S2003 (3R)

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback