NJ S1993 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous S2756
Note: Carry Over of previous A4316
Note: Carry Over of previous A4316
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 5 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-05 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee
Pending: Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 5 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-05 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee
Pending: Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires payment of State employees' compensation during involuntary furlough or temporary reduction in force due to late enactment of State annual appropriation act.
Title
Requires payment of State employees' compensation during involuntary furlough or temporary reduction in force due to late enactment of State annual appropriation act.
Sponsors
Sen. Vin Gopal [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-05 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A1577 (Same As) 2020-01-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee
S2756 (Carry Over) 2018-09-27 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
A4316 (Carry Over) 2018-07-30 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee
S2756 (Carry Over) 2018-09-27 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
A4316 (Carry Over) 2018-07-30 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2020/S1993 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2020/S2000/1993_I1.HTM |