NJ S1990 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous A3130

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on February 26 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-21 - Substituted by A1683
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Increases penalties for energy "slamming" practices.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Increases penalties for energy "slamming" practices.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-07 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-18 - Senate - Senate Economic Growth Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-21SenateSubstituted by A1683
2019-02-07SenateReported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
2018-10-18SenateReferred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
2018-10-18SenateReported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
2018-02-26SenateIntroduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Economic Growth Committee

Same As/Similar To

A1683 (Same As) 2019-04-17 - Approved P.L.2019, c.60.
A3130 (Carry Over) 2017-01-30 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Economic Growth Committee

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback