NJ A3130 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A1683
Note: Carry Foward to future S1990
Note: Carry Over of previous A3610
Note: Carry Foward to future S1990
Note: Carry Over of previous A3610
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 16-8)
Status: Engrossed on January 23 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-01-30 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Economic Growth Committee
Pending: Senate Economic Growth Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 23 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-01-30 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Economic Growth Committee
Pending: Senate Economic Growth Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Increases penalties for energy "slamming" practices.
Title
Increases penalties for energy "slamming" practices.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-01-23 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-12 - Assembly - Assembly Telecommunications and Utilities Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-12 - Assembly - Assembly Telecommunications and Utilities Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-01-30 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Economic Growth Committee |
2017-01-23 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (69-0-0) |
2017-01-12 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2016-02-22 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Telecommunications and Utilities Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A3130 (Carry Over) 2017-01-30 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Economic Growth Committee
A3130 (Carry Over) 2017-01-30 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Economic Growth Committee
A3610 (Carry Over) 2014-09-11 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Telecommunications and Utilities Committee
A3130 (Carry Over) 2017-01-30 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Economic Growth Committee
A3610 (Carry Over) 2014-09-11 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Telecommunications and Utilities Committee