NJ S1982 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 25 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-19 - Substituted by A3095 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 25 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-19 - Substituted by A3095 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides county clerks with additional week to mail ballots for 2020 primary election; requires ballot position draw to occur one day early if statutory date falls on holiday.
Title
Provides county clerks with additional week to mail ballots for 2020 primary election; requires ballot position draw to occur one day early if statutory date falls on holiday.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-05 - Senate - Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-19 | Senate | Substituted by A3095 (1R) |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A3095 (Same As) 2020-03-20 - Approved P.L.2020, c.5.