NJ S1962 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A1322
Note: Carry Foward to future S1953
Note: Carry Foward to future S103
Note: Carry Over of previous S2122
Note: Carry Over of previous A400
Note: Carry Foward to future S1953
Note: Carry Foward to future S103
Note: Carry Over of previous S2122
Note: Carry Over of previous A400
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 25 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-25 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee
Pending: Senate Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 25 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-25 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee
Pending: Senate Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that routine foot care services covered under certain insurance policies include coverage of services provided by podiatric physicians.
Title
Provides that routine foot care services covered under certain insurance policies include coverage of services provided by podiatric physicians.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-25 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S1962 (Carry Over) 2020-02-25 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee
S1962 (Carry Over) 2020-02-25 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee
S1962 (Carry Over) 2020-02-25 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee
A1303 (Same As) 2020-01-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Financial Institutions and Insurance Committee
S2122 (Carry Over) 2018-03-05 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
A400 (Carry Over) 2018-01-09 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Financial Institutions and Insurance Committee
S1962 (Carry Over) 2020-02-25 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee
S1962 (Carry Over) 2020-02-25 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee
A1303 (Same As) 2020-01-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Financial Institutions and Insurance Committee
S2122 (Carry Over) 2018-03-05 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
A400 (Carry Over) 2018-01-09 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Financial Institutions and Insurance Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2020/S1962 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2020/S2000/1962_I1.HTM |