NJ S103 | 2022-2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A2127
Note: Carry Over of previous S3307
Note: Carry Over of previous A5158
Note: Carry Over of previous S1962
Note: Carry Over of previous S3307
Note: Carry Over of previous A5158
Note: Carry Over of previous S1962
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-11 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee
Pending: Senate Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-11 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee
Pending: Senate Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Concerns certain requirements regarding experience and examination for nonresident military spouses seeking professional or occupational licensure.
Title
Concerns certain requirements regarding experience and examination for nonresident military spouses seeking professional or occupational licensure.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-11 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S103 (Carry Over) 2022-01-11 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee
S3307 (Carry Over) 2021-01-07 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee
A5158 (Carry Over) 2020-12-16 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Regulated Professions Committee
A1582 (Same As) 2022-01-11 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Regulated Professions Committee
S1962 (Carry Over) 2020-02-25 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee
S3307 (Carry Over) 2021-01-07 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee
A5158 (Carry Over) 2020-12-16 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Regulated Professions Committee
A1582 (Same As) 2022-01-11 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Regulated Professions Committee
S1962 (Carry Over) 2020-02-25 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2022/S103 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2022/S0500/103_I1.HTM |