NJ S1917 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future S685
Note: Carry Foward to future A3386
Note: Carry Over of previous A2845
Note: Carry Foward to future A3386
Note: Carry Over of previous A2845
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on February 22 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-10-18 - Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 22 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-10-18 - Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Permits municipal, county, and regional police and fire forces to establish five-year residency requirement for police officers and firefighters; allows exceptions to requirement under certain circumstances.
Title
Permits municipal, county, and regional police and fire forces to establish five-year residency requirement for police officers and firefighters; allows exceptions to requirement under certain circumstances.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-10-18 - Senate - Senate Economic Growth Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-10-18 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2018-09-27 | Senate | Transferred to Senate Economic Growth Committee |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S1917 (Carry Over) 2018-10-18 - Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
S1917 (Carry Over) 2018-10-18 - Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
A2922 (Same As) 2018-02-01 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee
A2845 (Carry Over) 2016-02-16 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee
S1917 (Carry Over) 2018-10-18 - Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
A2922 (Same As) 2018-02-01 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee
A2845 (Carry Over) 2016-02-16 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee