NJ S1895 | 2014-2015 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future S503
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 18 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-06-01 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Education Committee
Pending: Assembly Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 18 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-06-01 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Education Committee
Pending: Assembly Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires that if a school district satisfies 80% or more of the required NJ Quality Single Accountability Continuum standards in an area of district effectiveness under State intervention, the State must return that area to local control.
Title
Requires that if a school district satisfies 80% or more of the required NJ Quality Single Accountability Continuum standards in an area of district effectiveness under State intervention, the State must return that area to local control.
Sponsors
Sen. Teresa Ruiz [D] | Sen. Nellie Pou [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-05-18 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 11 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-18 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 11 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-12-08 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-09-18 - Senate - Senate Education Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-18 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 11 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-12-08 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-09-18 - Senate - Senate Education Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-01 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Education Committee |
2015-05-18 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (21-11) |
2014-12-08 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2014-09-18 | Senate | Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2014-09-18 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2014-03-27 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Education Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S1895 (Carry Over) 2015-06-01 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Education Committee
A3080 (Same As) 2014-05-08 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Education Committee
A3080 (Same As) 2014-05-08 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Education Committee