NJ S1893 | 2014-2015 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future S650
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on March 27 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-06-26 - Substituted by A2956 (2R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 27 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-06-26 - Substituted by A2956 (2R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides $21 minimum annual energy assistance to qualified families; qualifies families to receive additional nutritional assistance.
Title
Provides $21 minimum annual energy assistance to qualified families; qualifies families to receive additional nutritional assistance.
Sponsors
Sen. Shirley Turner [D] | Sen. Joseph Vitale [D] | Sen. Raymond Lesniak [D] | Sen. Loretta Weinberg [D] |
Sen. Nellie Pou [D] | Sen. Robert Gordon [D] | Sen. Teresa Ruiz [D] | Sen. Brian Stack [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-06-23 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-19 - Senate - Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-19 - Senate - Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-26 | Senate | Substituted by A2956 (2R) |
2014-06-23 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2014-05-19 | Senate | Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2014-05-19 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2014-03-27 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S1893 (Carry Over) 2014-06-26 - Substituted by A2956 (2R)
A2956 (Same As) 2015-01-29 - Lost in the Assembly AVOR (43-21-7) (Mosquera)
A2956 (Same As) 2015-01-29 - Lost in the Assembly AVOR (43-21-7) (Mosquera)