NJ S1878 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-30 - Approved P.L.2018, c.24.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-30 - Approved P.L.2018, c.24.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
"New Jersey Health Insurance Premium Security Act;" establishes health insurance reinsurance plan.
Title
"New Jersey Health Insurance Premium Security Act;" establishes health insurance reinsurance plan.
Sponsors
Sen. Joseph Vitale [D] | Sen. Troy Singleton [D] | Sen. John McKeon [D] | Rep. Pamela Lampitt [D] |
Rep. Carol Murphy [D] | Sen. Linda Greenstein [D] | Sen. Raj Mukherji [D] | Rep. Mila Jasey [D] |
Rep. Eliana Marin [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-04-12 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A3379 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-12 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 24 N: 13 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-12 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 46 N: 22 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-05 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 8 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-05 - Senate - Senate Commerce Committee: Reported with Substitution (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-05 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-15 - Senate - Senate Commerce Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-12 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 24 N: 13 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-12 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 46 N: 22 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-05 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 8 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-05 - Senate - Senate Commerce Committee: Reported with Substitution (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-05 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-15 - Senate - Senate Commerce Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-30 | Assembly | Approved P.L.2018, c.24. |
2018-04-12 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (46-22-0) |
2018-04-12 | Assembly | Substituted for A3379 (ACS) |
2018-04-12 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly without Reference, 2nd Reading |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (24-13) |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee as a Substitute, 2nd Reading |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Recommitted to Senate Commerce Committee |
2018-03-05 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A3379 (Same As) 2018-04-12 - Substituted by S1878 (SCS)