NJ S1876 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous S447

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-1)
Status: Passed on May 30 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-30 - Approved P.L.2018, c.23.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Requires Commissioner of Education to include data on chronic absenteeism and disciplinary suspensions on School Report Card and requires public schools to make certain efforts to combat chronic absenteeism.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requires Commissioner of Education to include data on chronic absenteeism and disciplinary suspensions on School Report Card and requires public schools to make certain efforts to combat chronic absenteeism.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-12 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A2192 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-12 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-12 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-26 - Senate - Senate Floor: Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-26 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-05 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - Senate - Senate Education Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-30AssemblyApproved P.L.2018, c.23.
2018-04-12AssemblyPassed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (69-0-0)
2018-04-12AssemblySubstituted for A2192 (1R)
2018-04-12AssemblyReceived in the Assembly without Reference, 2nd Reading
2018-04-12SenatePassed by the Senate (36-0)
2018-03-26SenateSenate Amendment (38-0) (Ruiz)
2018-03-05SenateReported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
2018-02-22SenateReferred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
2018-02-22SenateReported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
2018-02-15SenateIntroduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Education Committee

Same As/Similar To

S447 (Carry Over) 2018-01-08 - Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (69-0-0)
A2192 (Same As) 2018-04-12 - Substituted by S1876 (1R)

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback