NJ S1874 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous S1680

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-3)
Status: Passed on January 9 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-01-09 - Approved P.L.2019, c.281.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Establishes special license plates to bring awareness to breast cancer.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishes special license plates to bring awareness to breast cancer.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-11-25 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A921 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-11-25 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-11-18 - Assembly - Assembly Women and Children Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-13 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-17 - Senate - Senate Transportation Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-01-09AssemblyApproved P.L.2019, c.281.
2019-11-25AssemblyPassed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (74-0-0)
2019-11-25AssemblySubstituted for A921 (1R)
2019-11-18AssemblyReported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
2019-05-16AssemblyReceived in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Women and Children Committee
2019-05-13SenatePassed by the Senate (35-0)
2019-03-25SenateSenate Amendment (32-0) (Ruiz)
2019-01-17SenateReported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2018-02-15SenateIntroduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Transportation Committee

Same As/Similar To

A921 (Same As) 2019-11-25 - Substituted by S1874 (2R)
S1680 (Carry Over) 2016-02-29 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Transportation Committee

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback