NJ S1863 | 2022-2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A1118
Note: Carry Foward to future S840
Note: Carry Over of previous S734
Note: Carry Over of previous A2415
Note: Carry Foward to future S840
Note: Carry Over of previous S734
Note: Carry Over of previous A2415
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 28 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-28 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Pending: Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 28 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-28 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Pending: Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Revises gross income tax rates for joint filers and similar taxpayers and designated as Marriage Penalty Elimination Act.
Title
Revises gross income tax rates for joint filers and similar taxpayers and designated as Marriage Penalty Elimination Act.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-28 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S1863 (Carry Over) 2022-02-28 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
S1863 (Carry Over) 2022-02-28 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
A2059 (Same As) 2023-02-27 - Motion Table (41-34-0) (Reynolds-Jackson)
S734 (Carry Over) 2020-01-14 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
A2415 (Carry Over) 2020-02-03 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
S1863 (Carry Over) 2022-02-28 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
A2059 (Same As) 2023-02-27 - Motion Table (41-34-0) (Reynolds-Jackson)
S734 (Carry Over) 2020-01-14 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
A2415 (Carry Over) 2020-02-03 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2022/S1863 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2022/S2000/1863_I1.HTM |