NJ S1860 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous A3636

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on July 1 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-07-30 - Received in the Assembly without Reference, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Provides immunity from civil and criminal liability for rescue of animal from motor vehicle under inhumane conditions.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides immunity from civil and criminal liability for rescue of animal from motor vehicle under inhumane conditions.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-07-01 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-21 - Senate - Senate Floor: Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-21 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-31 - Senate - Senate Economic Growth Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-07-30AssemblyReceived in the Assembly without Reference, 2nd Reading
2018-07-01SenatePassed by the Senate (37-0)
2018-06-25SenateSenate Amendment (35-0) (Cruz-Perez)
2018-06-21SenateSenate Amendment (32-0) (Cruz-Perez)
2018-05-31SenateReported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
2018-02-15SenateIntroduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Economic Growth Committee

Same As/Similar To

A2318 (Same As) 2018-05-17 - Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
A3636 (Carry Over) 2017-12-20 - Received in the Assembly, 2nd Reading on Concurrence

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback