NJ S1847 | 2014-2015 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future S345
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 24 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-12-17 - Reported from Senate Committee as a Substitute, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 24 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-12-17 - Reported from Senate Committee as a Substitute, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Expands crime of invasion of privacy to include "upskirting"; photographing or filming the image of the undergarment-clad intimate parts of another.*
Title
Expands crime of invasion of privacy to include "upskirting"; photographing or filming the image of the undergarment-clad intimate parts of another.*
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-12-17 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee: Reported with Substitution (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-12-17 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee as a Substitute, 2nd Reading |
2015-12-10 | Senate | Transferred to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2014-03-24 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S1847 (Carry Over) 2015-12-17 - Reported from Senate Committee as a Substitute, 2nd Reading
A2992 (Same As) 2015-06-04 - Combined with A3864/3938 (ACS)
A3864 (Same As) 2015-12-17 - Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
A2992 (Same As) 2015-06-04 - Combined with A3864/3938 (ACS)
A3864 (Same As) 2015-12-17 - Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading