NJ A3864 | 2014-2015 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A156
Note: Carry Foward to future A2306
Note: Carry Foward to future S345
Note: Carry Foward to future A2306
Note: Carry Foward to future S345
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Engrossed on June 25 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-12-17 - Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 25 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-12-17 - Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Protects right to privacy underneath clothing; establishes crime of "upskirting".
Title
Protects right to privacy underneath clothing; establishes crime of "upskirting".
Sponsors
Rep. Cleopatra Tucker [D] | Rep. Valerie Huttle [D] | Rep. Ronald Dancer [R] | Rep. Annette Quijano [D] |
Rep. Benjie Wimberly [D] | Rep. Gabriela Mosquera [D] | Rep. Elizabeth Maher Muoio [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-12-17 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-25 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-25 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-04 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Reported with Substitution (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-25 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-25 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-04 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Reported with Substitution (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-12-17 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2015-06-29 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2015-06-25 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (78-0-0) |
2015-06-04 | Assembly | Reported from Assembly Comm. as a Substitute, 2nd Reading |
2014-10-27 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Judiciary Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A3864 (Carry Over) 2015-12-17 - Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
A3864 (Carry Over) 2015-12-17 - Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
A3864 (Carry Over) 2015-12-17 - Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
S1847 (Same As) 2015-12-17 - Reported from Senate Committee as a Substitute, 2nd Reading
A3864 (Carry Over) 2015-12-17 - Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
A3864 (Carry Over) 2015-12-17 - Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
S1847 (Same As) 2015-12-17 - Reported from Senate Committee as a Substitute, 2nd Reading