NJ S1841 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-06-21 - Substituted by A3438 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Requires Director of the Division of Taxation to establish six-month State tax amnesty period that ends no later than December 31, 2018.*

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requires Director of the Division of Taxation to establish six-month State tax amnesty period that ends no later than December 31, 2018.*

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-18 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported with Substitution (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-21SenateSubstituted by A3438 (1R)
2018-06-18SenateReported from Senate Committee as a Substitute, 2nd Reading
2018-02-08SenateIntroduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee

Same As/Similar To

A3438 (Same As) 2018-07-01 - Approved P.L.2018, c.46.

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback