NJ S1796 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A1672
Note: Carry Over of previous A3908
Note: Carry Over of previous S2409
Note: Carry Over of previous A3908
Note: Carry Over of previous S2409
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 24 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-24 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Education Committee
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 24 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-24 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Education Committee
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that State pay high school equivalency exam fees for low-income individuals.
Title
Provides that State pay high school equivalency exam fees for low-income individuals.
Sponsors
Sen. Teresa Ruiz [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-24 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Education Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S1796 (Carry Over) 2020-02-24 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Education Committee
A1655 (Same As) 2020-01-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Education Committee
A3908 (Carry Over) 2018-05-07 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Education Committee
S2409 (Carry Over) 2018-04-05 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Education Committee
A1655 (Same As) 2020-01-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Education Committee
A3908 (Carry Over) 2018-05-07 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Education Committee
S2409 (Carry Over) 2018-04-05 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Education Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2020/S1796 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2020/S2000/1796_I1.HTM |