NJ S1795 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous A4802
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 7 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-25 - Substituted by A1955 (2R)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 7 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-25 - Substituted by A1955 (2R)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides for voluntary discharge of personal representitives overseeing administration of estates by application to the Surrogate's Court or Surrogate's Office.*
Title
Provides for voluntary discharge of personal representitives overseeing administration of estates by application to the Surrogate's Court or Surrogate's Office.*
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-13 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee: Reported with Substitution (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-25 | Senate | Substituted by A1955 (2R) |
2017-03-13 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee as a Substitute, 2nd Reading |
2016-03-07 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A1955 (Same As) 2017-08-07 - Approved P.L.2017, c.208.
A4802 (Carry Over) 2015-12-03 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Judiciary Committee
A4802 (Carry Over) 2015-12-03 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Judiciary Committee