NJ A1955 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous A4802
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-07 - Approved P.L.2017, c.208.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-07 - Approved P.L.2017, c.208.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Provides for voluntary discharge of personal representitives overseeing administration of estates by application to the Surrogate's Court.**
Title
Provides for voluntary discharge of personal representitives overseeing administration of estates by application to the Surrogate's Court.**
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-22 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Concur in Senate Amendments (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute For S1795 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-13 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-10-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-06 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute For S1795 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-13 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-10-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-06 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-08-07 | Assembly | Approved P.L.2017, c.208. |
2017-06-22 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (75-0-0) |
2017-06-22 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, 2nd Reading on Concurrence |
2017-06-19 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (39-0) |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Senate Amendment (36-0) (Bucco) |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Substituted for S1795 (SCS) |
2017-03-13 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2016-11-03 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2016-10-20 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (73-0-0) |
2016-06-06 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2016-01-27 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Judiciary Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A4802 (Carry Over) 2015-12-03 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Judiciary Committee
S1795 (Same As) 2017-05-25 - Substituted by A1955 (2R)
S1795 (Same As) 2017-05-25 - Substituted by A1955 (2R)