NJ S1789 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future S1472
Note: Carry Foward to future A5799
Note: Carry Over of previous A4109
Note: Carry Over of previous S2597
Note: Carry Foward to future A5799
Note: Carry Over of previous A4109
Note: Carry Over of previous S2597
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-19 - Senate Amendment (24-0) (Beach)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-19 - Senate Amendment (24-0) (Beach)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes DOT to establish and administer toll collection and enforcement system on behalf of NJ toll authorities and to enter into reciprocal agreements for enforcement of toll violations with toll authorities from other states.
Title
Authorizes DOT to establish and administer toll collection and enforcement system on behalf of NJ toll authorities and to enter into reciprocal agreements for enforcement of toll violations with toll authorities from other states.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-19 - Senate - Senate Floor: Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-19 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 16 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-08 - Senate - Senate Transportation Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-19 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 16 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-08 - Senate - Senate Transportation Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-19 | Senate | Senate Amendment (24-0) (Beach) |
2020-10-08 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Transportation Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S1789 (Carry Over) 2021-02-19 - Senate Amendment (24-0) (Beach)
S1789 (Carry Over) 2021-02-19 - Senate Amendment (24-0) (Beach)
A2556 (Same As) 2021-11-08 - Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
A4109 (Carry Over) 2018-09-17 - Reported out of Asm. Comm. with Amendments, and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
S2597 (Carry Over) 2018-06-11 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
S1789 (Carry Over) 2021-02-19 - Senate Amendment (24-0) (Beach)
A2556 (Same As) 2021-11-08 - Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
A4109 (Carry Over) 2018-09-17 - Reported out of Asm. Comm. with Amendments, and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
S2597 (Carry Over) 2018-06-11 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee