NJ S1784 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous A3913

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-08 - Approved P.L.2019, c.85.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Provides Medicaid coverage for doula care.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides Medicaid coverage for doula care.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-25 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 69 N: 6 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A1662 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-18 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 30 N: 6 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-10 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-15 - Senate - Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-08SenateApproved P.L.2019, c.85.
2019-03-25SenatePassed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (33-0)
2019-03-25SenateReceived in the Senate, 2nd Reading on Concurrence
2019-03-25AssemblyPassed by the Assembly (69-6-4)
2019-03-25AssemblySubstituted for A1662 (1R)
2019-03-18AssemblyReported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2019-02-07AssemblyReceived in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
2019-01-31SenatePassed by the Senate (30-6)
2018-12-10SenateReported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
2018-02-15SenateReferred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
2018-02-15SenateReported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
2018-02-05SenateIntroduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee

Same As/Similar To

A1662 (Same As) 2019-03-25 - Substituted by S1784 (1R)
A3913 (Carry Over) 2016-06-20 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback