NJ S1773 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous S3208

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-3)
Status: Passed on March 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-18 - Approved P.L.2019, c.43.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Requires display of identifying information on rear of school bus so public may report bus driver misconduct.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requires display of identifying information on rear of school bus so public may report bus driver misconduct.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-01-31 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A4031 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-17 - Assembly - Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-29 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-07-26 - Senate - Senate Transportation Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-18AssemblyApproved P.L.2019, c.43.
2019-01-31AssemblyPassed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (75-0-0)
2019-01-31AssemblySubstituted for A4031 (1R)
2019-01-17AssemblyReported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
2018-11-26AssemblyReceived in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee
2018-10-29SenatePassed by the Senate (40-0)
2018-07-26SenateReported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2018-07-26SenateTransferred to Senate Transportation Committee
2018-02-05SenateIntroduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee

Same As/Similar To

S3208 (Carry Over) 2017-05-18 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee
A4031 (Same As) 2019-01-31 - Substituted by S1773 (1R)

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback