NJ S1740 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on January 28 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-01-29 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee
Pending: Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Requires MVC to place notation on vehicle's registration certificate indicating registrant is deaf.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requires MVC to place notation on vehicle's registration certificate indicating registrant is deaf.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-01-28 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-21 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-08 - Senate - Senate Transportation Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-01-29AssemblyReceived in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee
2021-01-28SenatePassed by the Senate (33-0)
2021-01-21SenateReported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2020-10-08SenateReferred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
2020-10-08SenateReported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
2020-02-13SenateIntroduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Transportation Committee

Same As/Similar To

A2409 (Same As) 2020-02-03 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback