NJ S1729 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous S3190
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-2)
Status: Passed on May 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-10 - Approved P.L.2019, c.104.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-2)
Status: Passed on May 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-10 - Approved P.L.2019, c.104.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Designates Streptomyces griseus as New Jersey State Microbe.
Title
Designates Streptomyces griseus as New Jersey State Microbe.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-14 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A3650 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-09-17 - Assembly - Assembly Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-07-26 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-14 - Senate - Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A3650 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-09-17 - Assembly - Assembly Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-07-26 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-14 - Senate - Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-10 | Senate | Approved P.L.2019, c.104. |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (34-0) |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Received in the Senate, 2nd Reading on Concurrence |
2019-02-25 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (76-0-0) |
2019-02-25 | Assembly | Substituted for A3650 (1R) |
2018-09-17 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2018-09-13 | Assembly | Transferred to Assembly Science, Innovation and Technology Committee |
2018-07-30 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Tourism, Gaming and the Arts Committee |
2018-07-26 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (33-0) |
2018-06-14 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S3190 (Carry Over) 2018-01-08 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee
A3650 (Same As) 2019-02-25 - Substituted by S1729 (1R)
A3650 (Same As) 2019-02-25 - Substituted by S1729 (1R)