NJ S171 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future S446
Note: Carry Foward to future A4992
Note: Carry Over of previous S577
Note: Carry Foward to future A4992
Note: Carry Over of previous S577
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on September 27 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-12-06 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on September 27 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-12-06 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Permits counties to share county tax administrators.
Title
Permits counties to share county tax administrators.
Sponsors
Sen. Michael Doherty [R] | Sen. Stephen Sweeney [D] | Sen. Anthony R. Bucco [R] | Sen. Christopher Bateman [R] |
Sen. Dawn Addiego [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-12-06 - Assembly - Assembly State and Local Government Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-09-27 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-11 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-09-27 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-11 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-12-06 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2018-10-15 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee |
2018-09-27 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (38-1) |
2018-06-11 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2018-05-14 | Senate | Transferred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2018-01-09 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S171 (Carry Over) 2018-12-06 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
S171 (Carry Over) 2018-12-06 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
S577 (Carry Over) 2016-01-12 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee
A439 (Same As) 2018-12-06 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
S171 (Carry Over) 2018-12-06 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
S577 (Carry Over) 2016-01-12 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee
A439 (Same As) 2018-12-06 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2018/S171 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2018/S0500/171_I1.HTM |
Roll Call | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bills/BillView.asp?BillNumber=S171 |