NJ S1707 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on July 19 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-19 - Approved P.L.2019, c.174.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on July 19 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-19 - Approved P.L.2019, c.174.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Exempts governmental entities acquiring lands for open space located in a deed-authorized common interest community from paying community fees if, at time of acquisition, community has never been formed or has been dissolved or discontinued.
Title
Exempts governmental entities acquiring lands for open space located in a deed-authorized common interest community from paying community fees if, at time of acquisition, community has never been formed or has been dissolved or discontinued.
Sponsors
Sen. Steven Oroho [R] | Sen. Christopher Bateman [R] | Sen. Parker Space [R] | Sen. Robert Andrzejczak [D] |
Rep. Harold Wirths [R] | Rep. Eric Houghtaling [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-23 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A2534 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-11 - Assembly - Assembly Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-09-27 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-09-13 - Senate - Senate Environment and Energy Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-11 - Assembly - Assembly Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-09-27 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-09-13 - Senate - Senate Environment and Energy Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-19 | Assembly | Approved P.L.2019, c.174. |
2019-05-23 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (76-0-0) |
2019-05-23 | Assembly | Substituted for A2534 |
2019-03-11 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2018-10-15 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee |
2018-09-27 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (39-0) |
2018-09-13 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A2534 (Same As) 2019-05-23 - Substituted by S1707