NJ S1700 | 2022-2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A1739
Note: Carry Over of previous A3485
Note: Carry Over of previous A3485
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on February 28 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-09 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Pending: Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 28 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-09 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Pending: Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes process for recovery of Superstorm Sandy aid overpayments and makes General Fund appropriation.
Title
Establishes process for recovery of Superstorm Sandy aid overpayments and makes General Fund appropriation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-09 - Senate - Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-09 | Senate | Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2022-05-09 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S1700 (Carry Over) 2022-05-09 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
A723 (Same As) 2022-01-11 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Oversight, Reform and Federal Relations Committee
A3485 (Carry Over) 2020-02-25 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Housing Committee
A723 (Same As) 2022-01-11 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Oversight, Reform and Federal Relations Committee
A3485 (Carry Over) 2020-02-25 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Housing Committee