NJ S1676 | 2024-2025 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous S2010
Note: Carry Over of previous A2540
Note: Carry Over of previous A2540
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 9 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-09 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
Pending: Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-09 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
Pending: Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires certain doctors and nurses to ask patients questions regarding menstrual cycles, previous tampon use, and toxic shock syndrome.
Title
Requires certain doctors and nurses to ask patients questions regarding menstrual cycles, previous tampon use, and toxic shock syndrome.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-09 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S2010 (Carry Over) 2022-03-03 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
A2540 (Carry Over) 2022-02-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Health Committee
A3707 (Same As) 2024-02-22 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Health Committee
A2540 (Carry Over) 2022-02-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Health Committee
A3707 (Same As) 2024-02-22 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Health Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2024/S1676 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2024/S2000/1676_I1.HTM |