NJ S1634 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous S3904
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 28 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-01-29 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee
Pending: Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 28 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-01-29 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee
Pending: Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Raises maximum eligibility age for exempt fireman certificates and membership in New Jersey State Firemen's Association.
Title
Raises maximum eligibility age for exempt fireman certificates and membership in New Jersey State Firemen's Association.
Sponsors
Sen. Michael Doherty [R] | Sen. Gerald Cardinale [R] | Sen. Anthony M. Bucco [R] | Sen. Steven Oroho [R] |
Sen. Declan O'Scanlon [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-01-28 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-12-11 - Senate - Senate Law and Public Safety Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-12-11 - Senate - Senate Law and Public Safety Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-29 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee |
2021-01-28 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (32-0) |
2020-12-10 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S3904 (Carry Over) 2019-06-10 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee
A3835 (Same As) 2020-03-16 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee
A3835 (Same As) 2020-03-16 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee