NJ S1576 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous A2546

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on December 17 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-03-07 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Prohibits awarding of economic development subsidy to business if payment of principal and interest on previously awarded loan or loan guarantee is greater than 24 months overdue.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Prohibits awarding of economic development subsidy to business if payment of principal and interest on previously awarded loan or loan guarantee is greater than 24 months overdue.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-07 - Assembly - Assembly Commerce and Economic Development Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-17 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-18 - Senate - Senate Economic Growth Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-07AssemblyReported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
2019-01-15AssemblyReceived in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Commerce and Economic Development Committee
2018-12-17SenatePassed by the Senate (39-0)
2018-10-18SenateReported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
2018-02-05SenateIntroduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Economic Growth Committee

Same As/Similar To

A299 (Same As) 2019-03-07 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
A2546 (Carry Over) 2016-02-29 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Economic Growth Committee

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback