NJ S1535 | 2022-2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous S3782
Note: Carry Over of previous A5718
Note: Carry Over of previous A5718
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on August 5 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-08-05 - Approved P.L.2022, c.93.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on August 5 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-08-05 - Approved P.L.2022, c.93.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Permits counties to operate airports as county utilities; provides that bonds for county and municipal airport purposes be issued in accordance with provisions of "Local Bond Law."
Title
Permits counties to operate airports as county utilities; provides that bonds for county and municipal airport purposes be issued in accordance with provisions of "Local Bond Law."
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-26 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 77 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-26 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A2861 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-10 - Assembly - Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-03 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-28 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-26 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A2861 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-10 - Assembly - Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-03 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-28 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-08-05 | Assembly | Approved P.L.2022, c.93. |
2022-05-26 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (77-2-0) |
2022-05-26 | Assembly | Substituted for A2861 |
2022-03-10 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2022-03-07 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (39-0) |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Transferred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Transportation Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S3782 (Carry Over) 2021-06-10 - Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
A5718 (Carry Over) 2022-01-04 - Received in the Senate without Reference, 2nd Reading
A2861 (Same As) 2022-05-26 - Substituted by S1535
A5718 (Carry Over) 2022-01-04 - Received in the Senate without Reference, 2nd Reading
A2861 (Same As) 2022-05-26 - Substituted by S1535