NJ S1518 | 2022-2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future S1007
Note: Carry Foward to future A3741
Note: Carry Over of previous A2514
Note: Carry Over of previous S1668
Note: Carry Foward to future A3741
Note: Carry Over of previous A2514
Note: Carry Over of previous S1668
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 10 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-10 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 10 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-10 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides rental and lease protections for victims of domestic violence, sexual assault, or stalking.
Title
Provides rental and lease protections for victims of domestic violence, sexual assault, or stalking.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-10 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S1518 (Carry Over) 2022-02-10 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee
S1518 (Carry Over) 2022-02-10 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee
A2514 (Carry Over) 2020-02-03 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Women and Children Committee
S1668 (Carry Over) 2020-02-13 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee
A2521 (Same As) 2022-02-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Women and Children Committee
S1518 (Carry Over) 2022-02-10 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee
A2514 (Carry Over) 2020-02-03 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Women and Children Committee
S1668 (Carry Over) 2020-02-13 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee
A2521 (Same As) 2022-02-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Women and Children Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2022/S1518 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2022/S2000/1518_I1.HTM |