NJ S1513 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session

Note: Carry Foward to future S1514
Note: Carry Over of previous S2361
Note: Carry Over of previous S2361

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2016 - 25% progression
Action: 2016-09-12 - Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Prohibits award of State contracts and development subsidies to inverted domestic corporations.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Prohibits award of State contracts and development subsidies to inverted domestic corporations.

Sponsors


Roll Calls


History

DateChamberAction
2016-09-12SenateReported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2016-02-16SenateIntroduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee

Same As/Similar To

S1513 (Carry Over) 2016-09-12 - Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
S2361 (Carry Over) 2016-01-07 - Substituted by A3624 (ACS/1R)
S2361 (Carry Over) 2016-09-21 - Approved P.L.2016, c.55.

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback