NJ S2361 | 2014-2015 | Regular Session

Note: Carry Foward to future S1513

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on September 15 2014 - 25% progression
Action: 2016-01-07 - Substituted by A3624 (ACS/1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Prohibits award of State contracts and development subsidies to inverted domestic corporations.*

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Prohibits award of State contracts and development subsidies to inverted domestic corporations.*

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-12-07 - Senate - Senate Floor: Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-12-07 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 15 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-29 - Senate - Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee: Reported with Substitution (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-01-07SenateSubstituted by A3624 (ACS/1R)
2015-12-07SenateSenate Amendment (25-0) (Turner)
2015-01-29SenateReported from Senate Committee as a Substitute, 2nd Reading
2014-09-15SenateIntroduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee

Same As/Similar To

S2361 (Carry Over) 2016-01-07 - Substituted by A3624 (ACS/1R)
A3678 (Same As) 2014-09-18 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee
A3624 (Same As) 2016-01-07 - Substituted for S2361 (SCS/1R)

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback