NJ S1507 | 2022-2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A910
Note: Carry Foward to future S1530
Note: Carry Over of previous S2669
Note: Carry Over of previous A4311
Note: Carry Over of previous S941
Note: Carry Foward to future S1530
Note: Carry Over of previous S2669
Note: Carry Over of previous A4311
Note: Carry Over of previous S941
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 10 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-10-06 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Pending: Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 10 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-10-06 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Pending: Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Revises and codifies schedule for childhood lead screenings; requires lead screenings as precondition of child's initial entry into school system.
Title
Revises and codifies schedule for childhood lead screenings; requires lead screenings as precondition of child's initial entry into school system.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-10-06 - Senate - Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-10-06 | Senate | Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2022-10-06 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S1507 (Carry Over) 2022-10-06 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
S1507 (Carry Over) 2022-10-06 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
S2669 (Carry Over) 2020-07-06 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
A4311 (Carry Over) 2020-06-25 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Women and Children Committee
A4827 (Same As) 2023-11-30 - Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
S941 (Carry Over) 2020-01-27 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Economic Growth Committee
S1507 (Carry Over) 2022-10-06 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
S2669 (Carry Over) 2020-07-06 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
A4311 (Carry Over) 2020-06-25 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Women and Children Committee
A4827 (Same As) 2023-11-30 - Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
S941 (Carry Over) 2020-01-27 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Economic Growth Committee