NJ A4311 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future S1507
Note: Carry Foward to future A4827
Note: Carry Over of previous A3555
Note: Carry Over of previous S1239
Note: Carry Foward to future A4827
Note: Carry Over of previous A3555
Note: Carry Over of previous S1239
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on June 25 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-25 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Women and Children Committee
Pending: Assembly Women and Children Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on June 25 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-25 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Women and Children Committee
Pending: Assembly Women and Children Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Revises and codifies schedule for childhood lead screening along with other immunization and wellness checks as precondition of child's initial entry into school system.
Title
Revises and codifies schedule for childhood lead screening along with other immunization and wellness checks as precondition of child's initial entry into school system.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-25 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Women and Children Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A4311 (Carry Over) 2020-06-25 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Women and Children Committee
A4311 (Carry Over) 2020-06-25 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Women and Children Committee
A3555 (Carry Over) 2018-03-12 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Women and Children Committee
S2669 (Same As) 2020-07-06 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
S1239 (Carry Over) 2018-01-25 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
A4311 (Carry Over) 2020-06-25 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Women and Children Committee
A3555 (Carry Over) 2018-03-12 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Women and Children Committee
S2669 (Same As) 2020-07-06 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
S1239 (Carry Over) 2018-01-25 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2020/A4311 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2020/A4500/4311_I1.HTM |