NJ S149 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future S1758
Note: Carry Foward to future A3141
Note: Carry Over of previous S963
Note: Carry Foward to future A3141
Note: Carry Over of previous S963
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-09-13 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Pending: Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-09-13 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Pending: Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes special Combat Action Badge license plate program.
Title
Authorizes special Combat Action Badge license plate program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-09-13 - Senate - Senate Transportation Committee: Reported with Substitution (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-09-13 | Senate | Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2018-09-13 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee as a Substitute, 2nd Reading |
2018-01-09 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Transportation Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S149 (Carry Over) 2018-09-13 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
S149 (Carry Over) 2018-09-13 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
S963 (Carry Over) 2016-02-04 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Transportation Committee
A111 (Same As) 2019-12-05 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
S149 (Carry Over) 2018-09-13 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
S963 (Carry Over) 2016-02-04 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Transportation Committee
A111 (Same As) 2019-12-05 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2018/S149 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2018/S0500/149_I1.HTM |
Roll Call | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bills/BillView.asp?BillNumber=S149 |